This case was last updated from Jackson County Florida Courts on 05/05/2022 at 05:07:01 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS PLISKIN, MARY

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PLISKIN, MARY. This case was filed in Jackson County Florida Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

PLISKIN, MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MARY BETH PLISKIN - 9/10/2021

09/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MARY BETH PLISKIN - 9/10/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - COPY OF ORDER APPROVING AND DISMISSING MAILED TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - REPORT TO THE COURT ON PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION, AS OF TODAY'S DATE, THE CLERK'S FILE SHOWS A RETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/10/2021 10:00; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: MEDIATION HEARING; Location: VIDEO CONFERENCING VIDEO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED: MARY PLISKIN - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE - 9/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent MEDIATION HEARING scheduled on 11/10/2021 at 1000 AM, VC - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: MARY BETH PLISKIN - 9/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2021011117

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase 322021SC000518SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI