This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 09/22/2020 at 20:27:00 (UTC).

MESSER, MIA WHITTINGTON VS MESSER, ELONZO DALE JR

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 MESSER, MIA WHITTINGTON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MESSER, ELONZO DALE JR. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR. and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR.

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MESSER, MIA WHITTINGTON

Respondent

MESSER, ELONZO DALE JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketRECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNOTES: A FINAL ORDER SHOULD BE SIGNED IN THE NEXT WEEK OR SO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSENT TO COURT PROGRAM SPECIALIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE CASES X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER, AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2020008893

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase 322020DR000249DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J assigned

    Read MoreRead Less