This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 11/11/2021 at 20:30:16 (UTC).

MERRILL, MARIAH, MERRILL, MARIAH K Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 MERRILL, MARIAH, MERRILL, MARIAH K was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J, JAMES GOODMAN JR and GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

JAMES GOODMAN JR

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MERRILL, MARIAH KERRI

Not Classified By Court

MERRILL, MARIAH K

MERRILL, MARIAH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: 11/1/21 (ORSH) by JCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event DV HEARINGS on 11/3/2021 0910 AM Judge JAMES GOODMAN JR results DISPOSED on 11/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNOTE: ODTJ sent to JCSO for information only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCLERK MINUTE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketORDER DENYING PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDEPUTY WORKSHEET: 11/01/21 (ORSH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: 10/20/21 NOT FOUND, COURT DATE EXPIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET: ORSH sent to JCSO for service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCLERK MINUTE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING WITHOUT ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION: 10/20/2021 at 10:10 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO PETITIONER REGARDING CONTACT TELEPHONE NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER STATEMENT REGARDING CONTACT WITH LAW ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF IDENTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF IDENTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase 322021DR000144DVAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less