This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/30/2021 at 05:33:59 (UTC).

MERCER, DOROTHY Et Al VS ALL REPAIR AND RESTORATION LLC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 MERCER, DOROTHY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALL REPAIR AND RESTORATION LLC. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCER, TERRY

MERCER, DOROTHY

Defendant

ALL REPAIR AND RESTORATION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERRY, HENRY LAWRENCE

Defendant Attorney

WOLLAND, FRANK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

06/30/2021:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

COMPLAINT

06/30/2021:COMPLAINT

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/19/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: Frank Wolland Assigned to ALL REPAIR AND RESTORATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DOLAN ARAGON, SUPERVISOR 6/30/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEMAILED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS' ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff Attorney: H LAWRENCE PERRY Assigned to DOROTHY MERCER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff Attorney: H LAWRENCE PERRY Assigned to TERRY MERCER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 6/30/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2021008191

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CA000133CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL REPAIR AND RESTORATION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERRY, HENRY LAWRENCE