This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 11/11/2021 at 23:03:26 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS ROCHELLE, BRANDY

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROCHELLE, BRANDY. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ROCHELLE, BRANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

CHURCHILL, ROBERT GEORGE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRANDY ROCHELLE - 10/12/2021

10/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRANDY ROCHELLE - 10/12/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/08/2021 09:00; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: MEDIATION HEARING; Location: VIDEO CONFERENCING VIDEO; Defendant Attorney: Churchill, Robert G JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE: SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON SPOUSE - BRANDY ROCHELLE - 10/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: Robert G Churchill JR Assigned to BRANDY ROCHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, DENIAL OF CLAIMS ON THE MERITS AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent MEDIATION HEARING scheduled on 12/8/2021 at 0900 AM, VC - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRANDY ROCHELLE - 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2021012406

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase 322021SC000582SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW