This case was last updated from Jackson County Florida Courts on 06/18/2022 at 23:03:53 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS DILMORE, BRYAN

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DILMORE, BRYAN. This case was filed in Jackson County Florida Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

DILMORE, BRYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRYAN DILMORE - 5/20/2022

05/20/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRYAN DILMORE - 5/20/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 07/06/2022 09:00; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: SC PRETRIAL MEDIATIO; Location: VIDEO CONFERENCING VIDEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BRYAN DILMORE - 5/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEvent SC PRETRIAL MEDIATIO scheduled on 7/6/2022 at 0900 AM, VC - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRYAN DILMORE - 5/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2022004952

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase 322022SC000237SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL