This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 09/30/2021 at 05:19:57 (UTC).

LONGBOTTOM, LESLI Et Al VS MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 LONGBOTTOM, LESLI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LONGBOTTOM, ROGER

LONGBOTTOM, LESLI

Defendant

MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIPPLE, MARTIN B

Defendant Attorney

MINACCI, DAVID KENNETH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/15/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

06/15/2021:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

ANSWER AND COUNTER CLAIM

07/09/2021:ANSWER AND COUNTER CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS AMENDED FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS ROGER LONGBOTTOM AND LESLI LONGBOTTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF LIONS GATE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketANSWER PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: David K Minacci Assigned to MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND COUNTER CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $395.00 Receipt Number MX 2021008618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $395.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED:6/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2021007475

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to LESLI LONGBOTTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to ROGER LONGBOTTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CA000107CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPPLE, MARTIN