This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 08/08/2019 at 19:01:33 (UTC).

LARAMORE, SHARON VS SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 LARAMORE, SHARON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J and GOODMAN, JAMES J JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARAMORE, SHARON

Defendant

SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HENDRIX, MICHELLE LYNN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

07/10/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Defendant Attorney: Michelle Hendrix Assigned to SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • LETTER FROM THE MORGAN LAW GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 7/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CA 2019001930

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Case 322019CA000349CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern Fidelity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENDRIX, MICHELLE L