This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 09/21/2020 at 23:16:33 (UTC).

JONES, MARION J Et Al VS MONTGOMERY DBA M & M CONSTRUCT Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 JONES, MARION J filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MONTGOMERY DBA M M CONSTRUCT. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOORE, VANICE G

JONES, MARION J

Defendants

MONTGOMERY DBA M & M CONSTRUCT

MONTGOMERY, BARRIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE: BARRIE MONTGOMERY - BARRIE MONTGOMERY DBA M&M CONSTRUCTION CO. - 9-2-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCompliance CNTY CIVIL MEDIATION has been created with due date of 12/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2020008968

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: BARRIE MONTGOMERY DBA M & M CONSTRUCTION CO. 8-28-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCase 322020SC000574SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONTGOMERY(D) is a litigant