This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 07/14/2019 at 19:02:36 (UTC).

JACKSON COUNTY VS NORTH FLORIDA HOSE TESTING SER Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 JACKSON COUNTY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NORTH FLORIDA HOSE TESTING SER. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J and GOODMAN, JAMES J JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON COUNTY

Defendants

NORTH FLORIDA HOSE TESTING SER

WALKER, JOHN H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN, KATHRYN MICHELLE BLANKENSHIP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/14/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED 7/3/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: BUSINESS NO LONGER EXISTS, GONE AT LEAST ONE YEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number CA 2019001887

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number CA 2019001698

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to JACKSON COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 6/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 6/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 322019CA000294CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.