This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 08/01/2019 at 19:03:12 (UTC).

HATCHER, JOSHUA Et Al VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 HATCHER, JOSHUA filed an Other lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J and GOODMAN, JAMES J JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HATCHER, TARA

HATCHER, JOSHUA

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEARMAN, SAMUEL WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

BOSCH, JOSE E.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

07/02/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Defendant Attorney: JOSE E BOSCH Assigned to UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANCT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • HOMEOWNERS POLICY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 7/2/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR E-SERVICE FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CA 2019001868

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to JOSHUA HATCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to TARA HATCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case 322019CA000340CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bosch, Jose E