This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/30/2021 at 05:33:01 (UTC).

HARRIS, LAURISE A VS STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 HARRIS, LAURISE A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS, LAURISE A

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVIN, YITZHAK SHMUEL

Defendant Attorney

DORE, DENNIS PATRICK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

07/01/2021:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/30/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED:7/14/2021

07/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED:7/14/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: Dennis P Dore Assigned to STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY, AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED 8/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED:7/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2021008790

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEMAILED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2021008246

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to LAURISE A HARRIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CA000142CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Florida Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVIN , YITZHAK S