This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 07/14/2019 19:05:23

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Other case was filed by HADFIELD, STEVEN R against SECRETARY DEPT OF CORRECTIONS in the jurisdiction of Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County
  • Judge GOODMAN JR, JAMES J
  • Courthouse Jackson County Courthouse
  • County Jackson
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Respondent SECRETARY DEPT OF CORRECTIONS
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Petitioner HADFIELD, STEVEN R
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • RECORDED ORDER TO IMPOSE FILING FEES
  • 06/21/2019
  • ORDER TO IMPOSE FILING FEES
  • 06/14/2019
  • SENT TO LAW CLERK FOR REVIEW
  • 06/14/2019
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS
  • 06/14/2019
  • LETTER FROM STEVEN HADFIELD
  • 06/14/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $25.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 322019CA000293CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J assigned

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.