This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/30/2021 at 05:34:43 (UTC).

GRANT, WILLIAM VS AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 GRANT, WILLIAM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANT, WILLIAM

Defendant

AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANZANILLA, LEO A.

Defendant Attorney

MEHTA, KALPESH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

06/28/2021:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

06/28/2021:COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: BRANDON J WILLIAMS Assigned to AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEMAILED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 6/28/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSTANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2021008102

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to WILLIAM GRANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CA000126CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Security Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manzanilla, Leo