This case was last updated from Jackson County Florida Courts on 05/02/2022 at 05:45:41 (UTC).

GLOVER, PANDORA A, MACK, BILLIE E SR Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 GLOVER, PANDORA A, MACK, BILLIE E SR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jackson County Florida Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J, GARCIA, ANA MARIA and GARCIA JR, ANA M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GARCIA, ANA MARIA

GARCIA JR, ANA M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MACK, BILLIE E SR

Decedent

GLOVER, PANDORA A

Not Classified By Court

GLOVER, PANDORA ANTIONETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SMITH, WALTER CRIT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketSATISFIED LETTER OF ADMINISTRATION action date changed to 2/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketSATISFIED LETTER OF ADMINISTRATION set on 2/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION with a due date 12/3/2021 updated with compliance action of SATISFIED LETTER OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketJUDGE HAS BEEN REASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketJudge: GARCIA JR, ANA M Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE AND STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTHCARE ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS ON FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE AND STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTHCARE ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE (TRUCATED EFILED COPY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL (COPY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL WILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINSTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CP000273PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, WALTER CRIT