This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 16:07:31 (UTC).

GEORGE, VIC Et Al VS RHODES, MARCUS

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 GEORGE, VIC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RHODES, MARCUS. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LONE OAK PROPERTIES, LLC

GEORGE, VIC

Defendant

RHODES, MARCUS

Not Classified By Court

RHODES, MARCUS DEON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE: MARCUS RHODES - SUBSTITUTE - 8-18-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketSENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY: MARCUS RHODES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2020008567

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: MARCUS RHODES AND ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION OF PREMISES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase 322020CC000544CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less