This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 02/19/2022 at 19:09:26 (UTC).

FIRST FEDERAL BANK VS BROOKS, DIXIE L Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 FIRST FEDERAL BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BROOKS, DIXIE L. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GARCIA, ANA MARIA, GARCIA, ANA M, JOHNSON, DAVID CHRISTOPHER and JOHNSON, DAVID C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GARCIA, ANA MARIA

GARCIA, ANA M

JOHNSON, DAVID CHRISTOPHER

JOHNSON, DAVID C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST FEDERAL BANK

Defendants

BROOKS, DIXIE L

MOTT, WILLIAM K

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DIXIE L BROO

UNKNOWN SPOUSE WILLIAM K MOTT

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHURCH, KELLEY LOUISE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

01/20/2022:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

01/20/2022:RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: NO SPOUSE EXISTS

01/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: NO SPOUSE EXISTS

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: WILLIAM K. MOTT 1/26/22

01/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: WILLIAM K. MOTT 1/26/22

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON DOES NOT EXIST

01/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON DOES NOT EXIST

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON IS DECEASED

01/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON IS DECEASED

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON DOES NOT EXIST

01/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON DOES NOT EXIST

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON DOES NOT EXIST

01/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON DOES NOT EXIST

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketJudge: JOHNSON , DAVID C Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON DOES NOT EXIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON DOES NOT EXIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON IS DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PER WILLIAM MOTT, THIS PERSON DOES NOT EXIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: WILLIAM K. MOTT 1/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: NO SPOUSE EXISTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketJudge: GARCIA , ANA M Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $974.00 Receipt Number MX 2022000659

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $974.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $974.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FIRST FEDERAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase 322022CA000010CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST FEDERAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Church, Kelley Louise