This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 03/22/2021 at 19:04:38 (UTC).

FARM CREDIT OF NORTHWEST FLORI VS AGRI AFC LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 FARM CREDIT OF NORTHWEST FLORI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AGRI AFC LLC. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J, GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR and GOODMAN, JAMES J JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARM CREDIT OF NORTHWEST FLORI

Defendants

AGRI AFC LLC

ROBERTS, WILLIAM A SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIST, MICHAEL P

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

02/26/2021:VERIFIED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE-SERVED: JANIS ROBERTS AS SPOUSE 3/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: RONNIE LONG AS CUSTOMER SERVICE SPECIALIST 3/9/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TO ISSUE PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-3/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-3/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002607

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002276

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FARM CREDIT OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA ACA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CA000039CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGRI AFC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIST, MICHAEL P