This case was last updated from Jackson County Florida Courts on 07/23/2022 at 23:07:20 (UTC).

Dry World LLC aao Rosalind Pit VS American Bankers Insurance Com

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Dry World LLC aao Rosalind Pit filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against American Bankers Insurance Com. This case was filed in Jackson County Florida Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dry World LLC aao Rosalind Pit

Defendant

American Bankers Insurance Com

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANZANILLA, LEO A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/03/2022 09:00; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: SC PRETRIAL MEDIATIO; Location: VIDEO CONFERENCING VIDEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEvent SC PRETRIAL MEDIATIO scheduled on 8/3/2022 at 0900 AM, VC - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA - 6/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2022006162

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to Dry World LLC aao Rosalind Pitman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase 322022SC000298SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRY WORLD, LLC A/A/O LUZ SARIENTO is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manzanilla, Leo