This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:31:30 (UTC).

CULKIN, CARA VS WOOD, MONICA

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 CULKIN, CARA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WOOD, MONICA. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MERCER, WADE and WADE MERCER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MERCER, WADE

WADE MERCER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CULKIN, CARA

Defendant

WOOD, MONICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCHECK IN REGISTRY FUNDS FOR PLAINTIFF FROM RENT DEPOSITED BY TENANT - CHECK MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $19.00 Receipt Number MX 2020000365

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $19.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $19.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED: 1-9-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ISSUED 1-3-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $473.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number TR 2019005987

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON: 12/9/2019 HANDED TO DEF FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase 322019CC000794CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less