This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:32:08 (UTC).

CULKIN, CARA VS RAMSEY, IVIN

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 CULKIN, CARA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RAMSEY, IVIN. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CULKIN, CARA

Defendant

RAMSEY, IVIN

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL ISSUED 12-19-19

12/19/2019:ORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL ISSUED 12-19-19

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $19.00 Receipt Number CC 2019000401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $19.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $19.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED: 12-19-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL ISSUED 12-19-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE: IVIN RAMSEY 12-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number TR 2019005986

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON: 12/9/2019 HANDED TO DEF FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase 322019CC000793CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less