This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 02/20/2021 at 16:07:00 (UTC).

COTTONDALE VILLA APTS VS WALKER, LINDA JOYCE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 COTTONDALE VILLA APTS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WALKER, LINDA JOYCE. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COTTONDALE VILLA APTS

Defendant

WALKER, LINDA JOYCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED BY DEFENDANT- CALLED AND SPOKE WITH TENANT- AS OF TODAY THE LANDLORD HADN'T BEEN GIVEN A COPY OF RESPONSE AND NO MONEY POSTED IN REGISTRY OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO LINDA JOYCE WALKER 2/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE: POSTED - LINDA JOYCE WALKER 1/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $202.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000841

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: LINDA JOYCE WALKER - 1/22/82021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CC000036CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less