This case was last updated from Jackson County Florida Courts on 05/05/2022 at 05:05:28 (UTC).

CONES, ROGER DEAN VS BROCK, BILLY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 CONES, ROGER DEAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROCK, BILLY. This case was filed in Jackson County Florida Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONES, ROGER DEAN

Defendant

BROCK, BILLY

Not Classified By Court

CONES, ROGER D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/18/2022 10:00; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: SC PRETRIAL MEDIATIO; Location: SEE INSTRUCTIONS ZOOM V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $15.00 Receipt Number MX 2022003043

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $15.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: BILLY BROCK 3/28/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEvent SC PRETRIAL MEDIATIO scheduled on 5/18/2022 at 1000 AM, ZM - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: BILLY BROCK - NOT FOUND - 2/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - REPORT TO THE COURT ON PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - PLAINTIFF FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION - THE CLERK FILE AS OF TODAY'S DATE DOES NOT CONTAIN PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT. DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/16/2022 10:00; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: MEDIATION HEARING; Location: VIDEO CONFERENCING VIDEO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $30.00 Receipt Number MX 2022000486

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $1,268.00 Receipt Number MX 2021011752

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $317.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $317.00 Balance Remaining $317.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: BILLY BROCK - 9/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent MEDIATION HEARING scheduled on 11/18/2021 at 1000 AM, VC - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCase 322021SC000545SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less