This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 08/08/2019 at 19:00:40 (UTC).

CLAYTON, DEBBIE VS SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 CLAYTON, DEBBIE filed an Other lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J and GOODMAN, JAMES J JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLAYTON, DEBBIE

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELAZQUEZ, LISBET

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED 7/10/19

07/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED 7/10/19

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

07/09/2019:COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • DEFENDANT'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number CA 2019001919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 7/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number CA 2019001916

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to DEBBIE CLAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Case 322019CA000345CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Velazquez, Lisbet, ESQ