This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:20:10 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS HARRISON, BRENDA S

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CITIBANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARRISON, BRENDA S. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

HARRISON, BRENDA S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

REPORT TO THE COURT ON MEDIATION CONFERENCE - NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT

01/24/2020:REPORT TO THE COURT ON MEDIATION CONFERENCE - NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: RECEIVED AFTER COURT DATE AND TIME 2-25-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT TO THE COURT ON MEDIATION CONFERENCE - NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/22/2020 08:30; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: SP PRETRIAL MEDIATIO; Location: THE JACKSON COUNTY COURTHOUSE JACKSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketEvent SP PRETRIAL MEDIATIO scheduled on 1/22/2020 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003441

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BRENDA S HARRISON 12-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 322019SC000776SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less