This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:23:05 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS THAXTON, VIRGINIA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THAXTON, VIRGINIA. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

THAXTON, VIRGINIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT REACHED (MED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/22/2020 08:30; Judge: MEDIATION, ASSIGNED; Docket Type: SP PRETRIAL MEDIATIO; Location: THE JACKSON COUNTY COURTHOUSE JACKSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: VIRGINIA THAXTON 12-18-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEvent SP PRETRIAL MEDIATIO scheduled on 1/22/2020 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge ASSIGNED MEDIATION presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 12/5/19 FOR PRETRIAL MEDIATION 1/22/20 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003423

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 322019SC000768SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less