This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 07/28/2019 at 19:00:58 (UTC).

CAPPS, HELEN VS AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 CAPPS, HELEN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J and GOODMAN, JAMES J JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPPS, HELEN

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EHRHARDT, ROBERT LEROY

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT

06/28/2019:AMENDED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • AMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 6/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CA 2019001825

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to HELEN CAPPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Case 322019CA000325CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EHRHARDT, ROBERT LEROY