This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/21/2020 at 12:29:53 (UTC).

CALLOWAY, DEBRA J, CALLOWAY, RONNIE N Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CALLOWAY, DEBRA J, CALLOWAY, RONNIE N was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CALLOWAY, DEBRA J

Decedent

CALLOWAY, RONNIE N

Not Classified By Court

CALLOWAY, RONNIE NATHANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVIS, JAMES CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketRECORDED AMENDED ORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINSTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS FOR INTESTATE CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FOR RONNIE NATHANIEL CALLOWAY, DATE OF DEATH MARCH 20, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT, WAIVER AND CONSENT FOR HOPE CALLOWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT, WAIVER AND CONSENT FOR CASEY CALLOWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION GREATER $1000.00 FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to DEBRA J CALLOWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 322019CP000341PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less