This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 10/15/2020 at 23:25:56 (UTC).

BYNUM, SHIRLEY A, FULP, SAMUEL R JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 BYNUM, SHIRLEY A, FULP, SAMUEL R JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR. and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR.

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

HORTON, IMOGENE W

WILLIAMS, DONALD W

ROBBINS, RYAN C

ROBBINS, STANLEY C

ROBBINS, CHRISTINA J

WATFORD, JANICE R

FULP, SAMUEL R JR

BYNUM, SHIRLEY A

WILLIAMS, CLIFFLENE

Decedent

WILLIAMS, CLEAVELENE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

NOLIN, NATHAN GARRETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketRECORDED LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DATED OCTOBER 11, 2000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DATED OCTOBER 11, 2000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FOR MARION MONROE WILLIAMS, DATE OF DEATH JANUARY 22, 2000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FOR CLEAVELENE SCOTT WILLIAMS, DATE OF DEATH JUNE 10, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER FOR DONALD W. WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER FOR JANICE R. WATFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER FOR SHIRLEY A. BYNUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DATED OCTOBER 11, 2000 (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCase 322020CP000249PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOLIN, NATHAN GARRETT