This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 08/08/2019 at 19:03:38 (UTC).

BURGE, EMILY VS HOGE, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 BURGE, EMILY filed an Other lawsuit against HOGE, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J and GOODMAN, JAMES J JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BURGE, EMILY

Respondent

HOGE, WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • Payment received: $8.35 Receipt Number CA 2019002264

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $8.35 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $8.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • RETURNED MAIL - ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • RECORDED PETITION TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT AND DECREE AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT TO MODIFY DOMESTICATED FOREIGN JUDGMENT AND DECREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Payment received: $841.35 Receipt Number CA 2019001943

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $841.35 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $841.35 Balance Remaining $841.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $800.35 Balance Remaining $800.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 no longer eligible for collections

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $792.00 Balance Remaining $792.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $442.00 Balance Remaining $442.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF EMILY BURGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • PETITION TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT AND DECREE AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT TO MODIFY DOMESTICATED FOREIGN JUDGMENT AND DECREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT AND DECREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Case 322019CA000347CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J assigned

    Read MoreRead Less