This case was last updated from Jackson County Florida Courts on 05/02/2022 at 05:45:15 (UTC).

BRYANT, GINA LUREE, HARRISON, LEVI CONNER Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 BRYANT, GINA LUREE, HARRISON, LEVI CONNER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jackson County Florida Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GARCIA, ANA MARIA, GARCIA JR, ANA M and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GARCIA, ANA MARIA

GARCIA JR, ANA M

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Decedent

HARRISON, MICHAEL

Not Classified By Court

HARRISON, LEVI CONNER

BRYANT, GINA LUREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MILTON, A CLAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketJUDGE HAS BEEN REASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketJudge: GARCIA JR, ANA M Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE TO: CROW-BURLINGAME CO.; JACKSON COUNTY FIRE RESCUE; RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF TALLAHASSEE; SOUTHEAST HEALTH; WELLS FARGO AUTO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NTC 1ST - OCTOBER 7, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE TO: LEVI CONNER HARRISON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE - AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketRECORDED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketRECORDED LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DATED MARCH 9, 2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2021011829

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to GINA LUREE BRYANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE - GINA LUREE BRYANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DATED MARCH 9, 2016 (e-filed copy)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE OF MICHAEL HARRISON DOD SEPTEMBER 9, 2021 (e-filed copy)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (TESTATE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CP000278PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILTON, A CLAY