This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/30/2021 at 05:34:11 (UTC).

BROGDON, FRANKLIN Et Al VS SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 BROGDON, FRANKLIN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and GOODMAN JR, JAMES J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROGDON, LISA

BROGDON, FRANKLIN

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMILTON, JAMES CLARK

Defendant Attorney

RICHARDSON, STEVEN KYLE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

06/29/2021:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketORDER OF RECUSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDefendant Attorney: Steven K Richardson Assigned to SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff Attorney: JAMES Clark HAMILTON JR Assigned to LISA BROGDON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff Attorney: JAMES Clark HAMILTON Jr. Assigned to FRANKLIN BROGDON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEMAILED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 6/29/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketJudge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2021008175

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCase 322021CA000131CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J CLARK HAMILTON, JR