This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:32:30 (UTC).

BREWTON, CORNELIUS VS CURRY, NATISHA SHARELLE

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 BREWTON, CORNELIUS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CURRY, NATISHA SHARELLE. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCER, WADE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCER, WADE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BREWTON, CORNELIUS

Defendant

CURRY, NATISHA SHARELLE

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE: NATISHA CURRY 12-10-19

12/12/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE: NATISHA CURRY 12-10-19

RECEIPT

12/09/2019:RECEIPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE: POSTED NATISHA CURRY 12-29-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $19.00 Receipt Number CC 2019000397

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $19.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $19.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED: 12-19-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL ISSUED: 12-19-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE: NATISHA CURRY 12-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number TR 2019005973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON: 12/09/2019 GIVEN TO DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH 3 DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase 322019CC000774CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less