This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 12/20/2019 at 19:05:17 (UTC).

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPA VS BROWN, DONALD D Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BROWN, DONALD D. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J, GOODMAN, JAMES J JR and JOHNSON, DAVID C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

JOHNSON, DAVID C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPA

Defendants

BROWN, LYDIA MARIE

BROWN, DONALD D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHOUSIS, JULIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Judge: JOHNSON , DAVID C Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 12/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 12/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE, REFORMATION OF MORTGAGE, AND REFORMATION OF DEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Payment received: $938.00 Receipt Number CA 2019003421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $938.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $938.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Case 322019CA000647CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.