This case was last updated from Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/07/2022 at 19:08:13 (UTC).

Bill Price PA VS Gilmore Academy and JCTS Youth

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 Bill Price PA filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Gilmore Academy and JCTS Youth. This case was filed in Jackson County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court , Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GARCIA, ANA MARIA and GARCIA, ANA M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GARCIA, ANA MARIA

GARCIA, ANA M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRYANT, ELMORE

Defendant

Gilmore Academy and JCTS Youth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PRICE, WILLIAM BANTON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/16/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED: GRADY SNELL, JR. 11/16/2022

11/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: GRADY SNELL, JR. 11/16/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED: GILMORE ACADEMY 11/16/2022

11/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: GILMORE ACADEMY 11/16/2022

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

11/16/2022:CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

RECEIPT

11/17/2022:RECEIPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAttorney: William Banton Price Assigned to ELMORE BRYANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketJudge: GARCIA , ANA M Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: GILMORE ACADEMY 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: GRADY SNELL, JR. 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2022011671

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to Bill Price PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCase 322022CA000199CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRICE, WILLIAM BANTON