This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County on 07/31/2019 at 19:02:28 (UTC).

BARAGGIA, ELIZABETH Et Al VS ATLANTIC ROOFING AND EXTERIORS

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 BARAGGIA, ELIZABETH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ATLANTIC ROOFING AND EXTERIORS. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN JR, JAMES J and GOODMAN, JAMES J JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Jackson County

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN JR, JAMES J

GOODMAN, JAMES J JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARAGGIA, ELIZABETH

BARAGGIA, WILLIAM

Defendant

ATLANTIC ROOFING AND EXTERIORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDERMOTT, THOMAS MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

SPIRES, WINTER EMIL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

07/01/2019:COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to ATLANTIC ROOFING AND EXTERIORS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CA 2019001864

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to ELIZABETH BARAGGIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to WILLIAM BARAGGIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED 7/1/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Case 322019CA000339CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPIRES, WINTER E