Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 02/20/2021 at 23:02:38 (UTC).

BACK AND NECK PAIN CLINIC LLC VS SUTTON, JEREMY TYRELL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 BACK AND NECK PAIN CLINIC LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUTTON, JEREMY TYRELL. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Jackson, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MERCER, WADE and WADE MERCER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Jackson County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Jackson County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MERCER, WADE

WADE MERCER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BACK AND NECK PAIN CLINIC LLC

Defendant

SUTTON, JEREMY TYRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PRIM, HARRY SAMUEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/18/2021 14:35; Judge: MERCER, WADE; Docket Type: MEDIATION HEARING; Location: THE JACKSON COUNTY COURTHOUSE COUNTY; Defendant Attorney: Prim, Harry Samuel ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event MEDIATION HEARING on 2/18/2021 0235 PM Judge WADE MERCER results CANCELLED on 2/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2021001768

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEREMY TYRELL SUTTON 2/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 2/18/2021 @ 2:35 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketJudge: MERCER , WADE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent MEDIATION HEARING scheduled on 2/18/2021 at 0235 PM, MX - Judge WADE MERCER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: JEREMY SUTTON - 1/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000750

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to JEREMY TYRELL SUTTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase 322021SC000032SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BACK AND NECK PAIN CLINIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRIM, HARRY SAMUEL