This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 12/02/2020 at 18:34:27 (UTC).

YOHN, JEFFERY, YOHN, MARGARET J Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 YOHN, JEFFERY, YOHN, MARGARET J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR, LUCAS N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YOHN, JEFFERY

Decedent

YOHN, MARGARET J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STIVERS, JUSTIN B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number EP 3396

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER DESIGNATING DEPOSITORY FOR ASSETS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/2/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCase 302020CP000111PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/2/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STIVERS, JUSTIN B