This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 11/15/2020 at 18:37:13 (UTC).

WALTON, JIMMIE F, WALTON, SHARON Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 WALTON, JIMMIE F, WALTON, SHARON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR, LUCAS N. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

 

Party Details

Decedent

WALTON, JIMMIE F

Not Classified By Court

WALTON, SHARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

YOUELL, RECA RENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE SHARON WALTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION FOR JIMMIE FRANK WALTON II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number EP 3371

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 11/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase 302020CP000102PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUELL, RECA RENE