Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 18:34:38 (UTC).

SHEFFIELD, MARY M, STONE, MARY Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 SHEFFIELD, MARY M, STONE, MARY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR, LUCAS N. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Holmes County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Holmes County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STONE, MARY

Decedent

SHEFFIELD, MARY M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PRATT, DENNIS LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS FOR INTESTATE CASES (SIGNED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS FOR INTESTATE CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATIVE ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number EP 3608

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 5/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase 302021CP000041PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRATT, DENNIS LEE