This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 11:49:19 (UTC).

RICE, JOE JR, RICE, RUTHIE V Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 RICE, JOE JR, RICE, RUTHIE filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR, LUCAS N. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RICE, JOE JR

Decedent

RICE, RUTHIE V

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK: 600 PAGE: 279

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMisc/Other PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketMisc/Other FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number EP 2970

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase 302019CP000111PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less