This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 05:56:05 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS MENDEZ, JOSE J

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against MENDEZ, JOSE J. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TAYLOR, LUCAS N and LUCAS TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

LUCAS TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

MENDEZ, JOSE J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/10/2020 13:00; Judge: TAYLOR, LUCAS N; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: COURTHOUSE County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 1/10/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge LUCAS TAYLOR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number EP 2975

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase 302019CC000300CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON DRAGUTSKY