This case was last updated from Holmes County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/07/2022 at 15:47:07 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC VS POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN PARTY IN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN PARTY IN. This case was filed in Holmes County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERTS, RUSSELL and ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERTS, RUSSELL

ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

WOODALL, ZACHARY R

WOODALL, STEVIE BEST

POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN PARTY IN

POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN PARTY IN

Not Classified By Court

WOODALL, STEVIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASPER, KATHRYN ISHEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketJudge: ROBERTS , RUSSELL Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $945.00 Receipt Number EP 4417

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $945.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STEVIE BEST WOODALL a/k/a STEVIE WOODALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ZACHARY R. WOODALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketOTHER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $945.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase 302022CA000317CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PennyMac Loan Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kasper, Kathryn I