This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 12:02:56 (UTC).

PEACOCK, TERRY VS PEACOCK, HAZEL

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 PEACOCK, TERRY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PEACOCK, HAZEL. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are REGISTER, TIMOTHY, REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN and DAVID JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

REGISTER, TIMOTHY

REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN

DAVID JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEACOCK, TERRY

Respondent

PEACOCK, HAZEL

Not Classified By Court

LOCKE, HAZEL DENISE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment Of Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 3/2/2020 at 0915 AM, MX - Judge DAVID JOHNSON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION AND REQUIREMENT TO ATTEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CV 10843

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketActive Process Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCase 302019DR000374DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketJudge: REGISTER , TIMOTHY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less