This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 05:55:25 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS CHANDLER, DIANNA

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CHANDLER, DIANNA. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TAYLOR, LUCAS N and LUCAS TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

LUCAS TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CHANDLER, DIANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER STIPULATED AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON COMPLIANCE WITH STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FOR COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/10/2020 13:00; Judge: TAYLOR, LUCAS N; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: COURTHOUSE County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number EP 2959

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCase 302019CC000291CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI