This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 11/10/2020 at 18:35:27 (UTC).

HOGAN, PETROYA C., TAYLOR, PETROYA C Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 HOGAN, PETROYA C , TAYLOR, PETROYA C was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR, LUCAS N. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN C

Decedent

TAYLOR, PETROYA C

Not Classified By Court

HOGAN, PETROYA C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GINSBERG, MICHAEL DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $41.00 Receipt Number CV 11499

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $41.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 11/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCAVEATOR'S COUNSEL'S DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCAVEAT BY CREDITOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase 302020CP000100CVAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/13/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Independent Saving Plan Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GINSBERG, MICHAEL DAVID