This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Holmes County on 04/29/2022 at 07:05:23 (UTC).

HARRISON, GREGORY CHAD VS CITY OF BONIFAY Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2021 HARRISON, GREGORY CHAD filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF BONIFAY. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Holmes County, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING and ROBERTS, RUSSELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING

ROBERTS, RUSSELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRISON, GREGORY CHAD

Defendants

CITY OF BONIFAY

SIMS, JAMES

WELLS, CHRIS

GILLEY, BEVERLY

PREFERRED GOVERNMENTAL CLAIM S

JOHN TATE IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTOX, MARIE A

Defendant Attorney

GRAHAM, WILLIAM BLITCH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT/OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketOTHER SHERIFF TATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketOTHER CONSENTED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO PREGERRED GOVERNMENTAL CLAIM SOLUTIONS, INC. C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: William B. Graham Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: William B. Graham Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: William B. Graham Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: William B. Graham Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: William B. Graham Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAMES E. SIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO PERFERRED GOVERNMENTAL CLAIM SOLUTIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JOHN TATE, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SHERIFF, HOLMES COUNTY, FLORIDA--HOLMES COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO DIVISION OF RISK MANAGEMENT-DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CITY OF BONIFAY C/O JAMES E. SIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 1/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $472.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • DocketCase 302021CA000313CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTOX, MARIE A