This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 12/05/2020 at 21:03:56 (UTC).

HARMON, FURIOUSE A VS HENDERSON, HEATHER

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 HARMON, FURIOUSE A filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HENDERSON, HEATHER. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are REGISTER, TIMOTHY and REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

REGISTER, TIMOTHY

REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARMON, FURIOUSE A

Defendant

HENDERSON, HEATHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUTZ, JEREMY A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketUCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE MOTHER'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketJudge: REGISTER , TIMOTHY Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketORDER DENYING EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR CHILD PICK UP ORDER EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR HEATHER HENDERSON EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF CHIPLEYLAW@GMAIL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number EP 3402

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/5/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCase 302020DR000269DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/5/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUTZ, JEREMY A.