This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 11/24/2020 at 18:36:13 (UTC).

GRANTHAM, KRISTIE L, LASTER, CRAIG T JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 GRANTHAM, KRISTIE L, LASTER, CRAIG T JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR, LUCAS N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRANTHAM, KRISTIE L

Not Classified By Court

LASTER, CRAIG T JR

LASTER, TYREKE

LASTER, JAKAYLA C

Decedent

LASTER, CRAIG TRUEHILL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketJudge: TAYLOR , LUCAS N Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINMENT OD PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number EP 3386

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 11/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCase 302020CP000106PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/27/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less