This case was last updated from Holmes County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 11:49:26 (UTC).

FRENCH, JOY MOON, MOON, PAUL Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 FRENCH, JOY MOON, MOON, PAUL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Holmes County Courts, Holmes County Courthouse located in Holmes, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR, LUCAS N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Holmes, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR, LUCAS N

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRENCH, JOY MOON

Claimant

FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE

Decedent

MOON, PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PRATT, DENNIS LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSTATEMNET REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIAL RECORD CONSENT TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketEstate Claim for $24,427.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY STATE OF FLORIDA, AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number EP 2972

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCompliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase 302019CP000112PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRATT, DENNIS LEE